EP0462025 - Disconnectable surge arrester for low-voltage installations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states MERLIN GERIN 2, chemin des Sources F-38240 Meylan / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonniau, Michel Merlin Gerin - Sce. Brevets F-38050 Grenoble Cedex / FR | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Schneider Electric SA Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Hecke, Gérard, et al Schneider Electric SA, Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1993/23] | Hecke, Gérard Merlin Gérin, Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | ||
Former [1991/51] | Kern, Paul Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91420173.6 | 30.05.1991 | [1991/51] | Priority number, date | FR19900007316 | 11.06.1990 Original published format: FR 9007316 | [1991/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462025 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0462025 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
H02H9/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/51] | Title | German: | Abtrennbarer Überspannungsableiter für Niederspannungseinrichtungen | [1991/51] | English: | Disconnectable surge arrester for low-voltage installations | [1991/51] | French: | Parafoudre déconnectable pour installations à basse tension | [1991/51] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0130851 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]); | [A]US4803436 (KRESGE JAMES S [US], et al) |