EP0489672 - Double flow ventilation unit, particularly for a technical compartment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR TECHNIC Rue du fort, Z.I. Geispolsheim-Gare F-67400 Illkirch Graffenstaden / FR | [1992/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lemair, Claude Le Mesnil Millon F-27620 Gasny / FR | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | Metz, Paul Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Metz, Paul CABINET METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63 F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR | ||
Former [1992/24] | Metz, Paul Cabinet METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau, B.P. no 63 F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91440104.7 | 04.12.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | FR19900015398 | 04.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015398 | [1992/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489672 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F04D25/16, F04D17/04 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
F04D17/04 (EP);
F04D25/166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1992/24] | Title | German: | Doppelstrombläseeinheit, insbesondere für einen technischen Raum | [1992/24] | English: | Double flow ventilation unit, particularly for a technical compartment | [1992/24] | French: | Unité de ventilation à double flux, notamment pour compartiment technique | [1992/24] | File destroyed: | 14.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/33] | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2905091 ; | [A]DE1198955 ; | [A]US3150816 ; | [A]US3680974 ; | [A]EP0246325 ; | [A]JPS5985496 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 195 (M-323)[1632]7 septembre 1984; & JP-A-59 85 496 (SUMIO YAMAGUCHI) 17-05-1984 |