EP0540797 - Machine to put a plurality of semiconductor devices in a row and to solder them to the conductors which connect them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leon, Paul 2, Impasse des Sablons F-27630 Berthenonville / FR | [1993/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 F-35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91460046.5 | 07.11.1991 | [1993/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540797 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/18, H01L31/05 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
H01L31/05 (EP);
H01L31/188 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1993/19] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Reihen und Löten einer Mehrzahl von Halbleitervorrichtungen mit den Verbindungsleitern | [1993/19] | English: | Machine to put a plurality of semiconductor devices in a row and to solder them to the conductors which connect them | [1993/19] | French: | Machine à mettre en rangée et à souder aux conducteurs qui les relient entre eux une pluralité de dispositifs à semi-conducteurs | [1993/19] | File destroyed: | 03.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 28.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.12.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4534502 ; | [A]DE4011485 ; | [A]DE3612269 ; | [A]DE3238187 ; | [A]JPS59115576 ; | [A]JPS60202968 | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS. vol. 21, no. 22, 15 Novembre 1982NEW YORK US page 4053; 'Automated solar-array assembly' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8no. 235 (E-275)(1672) 27 Octobre 1984 & JP-A-59 115 576 ( SHARP K. K. ) 4 Juillet 1984 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10no. 50 (E-384)(2107) 27 Février 1986 & JP-A-60 202 968 ( HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K. K. ) 14 Octobre 1985 |