EP0520115 - Flexible capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1996 [1996/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Catala, Gilles, "Les Vergers", Bât. K. 1978, av. de Provence F-06140 Vence / FR | 02 /
Lasmayoux, Casimir Villa, "Lou Salt", 202, chemin des Campons F-06480 La Colle sur Loup / FR | 03 /
Ferry, Michel 52, allée des Micocouliers, Hameau de Puissanton F-06220 Vallauris / FR | 04 /
Vachee, Pierre 46, av. des oliviers, Le Plan du Bois F-06610 La Gaude / FR | 05 /
Paci, André 449, av. F. Perraud F-06600 Antibes / FR | 06 /
Braquet, Henri J. "Les Templiers" F-06790 Aspremont / FR | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Bonneau, Gérard Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Industrielle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Bonneau, Gérard Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Industrielle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 91480094.1 | 28.06.1991 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520115 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520115 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/35, H01G4/14, H01R13/66, H01R13/658 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
H01G4/35 (EP);
H01G4/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/01] | H01G4/42, H01G4/14, H01R13/66, H01R13/658 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/09] |
Former [1993/01] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Flexibler Kondensator | [1993/01] | English: | Flexible capacitor | [1993/01] | French: | Condensateur flexible | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 27.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 15.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.08.1992 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3079012 ; | [A]DE3838265 ; | [A]DE3345942 ; | [AD]US4202594 | [A] - JEE JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING. vol. 23, no. 237, September 1986, TOKYO JP pages 72 - 99; T. IZUMI: 'Metallized Film Capacitors show their Mettle' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 250 (E-118)26 June 1991 & JP-A-3 079 012 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC ) 4 April 1991, & JP3079012 A 19910404 |