EP0483035 - Computer integrated manufacturing rework apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horejsi, Steven Arnold 1349 21st Street N.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | 02 /
Landon, Jack Richard 1315 Ridge Court N.E. Rochester, Minnesota 55906 / US | 03 /
Marquardt, Gregg Carlton 229 6th Avenue S .W., Apartment 11 Rochester, Minnesota 55902 / US | 04 /
Stokes, John Curtis 2215 52nd Street N.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1992/18] | Vekemans, André Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 91480148.5 | 26.09.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | US19900602529 | 24.10.1990 Original published format: US 602529 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0483035 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0483035 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483035 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32228 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US);
Y10S706/916 (US)
|
Former IPC [1992/18] | G06F15/21 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | Rechnerunterstütztes Gerät und Verfahren zur nachträglichen Änderung in der Produktion | [2001/14] | English: | Computer integrated manufacturing rework apparatus and method | [1992/18] | French: | Appareil et méthode de retouche de fabrication assistée par ordinateur | [2001/14] |
Former [1992/18] | Rechner integriertes Herstellungs-, wieder Verarbeitungsgerät und Verfahren | ||
Former [1992/18] | Appareil et méthode de retouche par fabrication intégrée par ordinateur | Examination procedure | 17.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 17.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 19.03.2002 | [2002/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0258553 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,11,16-19 * the whole document * [Y] 7-10,12-15,20-22; | [Y] - MUDIE D.C. AND CHANG N.H., "FAULTS: An Equipment Maintenance and Repair System Using a Relational Database", IEEE PROCEEDINGS OF TH 1990 IEMT SYMPOSIUM, CAT. NO. 89CH2864-7, WASHINGTON, DC USA, (19901003), pages 41 - 46, XP000220817 [Y] 7-10,12-15,20-22 | [A] - O'CONNELL P.F. AND OTT J.A., "TECHNICIAN'S ASSISTANT, A GENERIC KNOWLEDGE BASED DIAGNOSTIC TOOL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ATE & INSTRUMENTATION CONFERENCE WEST 1989, ANAHEIM, CA, USA, (19890126), pages 524 - 529 [A] 1-3,6,11 |