EP0539642 - Method for determining the composition of a compound color which is a mixture of basic component colors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pinchon, Didier 46, rue Crébillon F-94300 Vincennes / FR | [1993/18] | Representative(s) | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1993/18] | Vekemans, André Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 91480168.3 | 31.10.1991 | [1993/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0539642 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0539642 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/46, G01N21/47 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
G01J3/46 (EP);
G01J3/463 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Zusammensetzung einer aus einer Farbenmischung bestehenden Farbe | [1993/18] | English: | Method for determining the composition of a compound color which is a mixture of basic component colors | [1993/18] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la composition d'une couleur composée d'un mélange des couleurs de base | [1993/18] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 29.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0152950 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]DE2045341 |