EP0525273 - Process and apparatus for the determination of the coagulation time of blood and plasma [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUPO GRIFOLS, S.A. Poligono Levante, Can Guasch s/n E-08150 Parets Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states GRUPO GRIFOLS, S.A. Poligono Levante, Can Guasch s/n E-08150 Parets Del Valles, (Barcelona) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martinell Gisper-Sauch, Enrique Paseo San Juan, 34 E-08010 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Gasull Llampallas, Antonio Enric Borras, 30, 4o 1a E-08912 Badalona, (Barcelona) / ES | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Durán Moya, Luis-Alfonso, et al DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Duran Moya, Luis-Alfonso, et al DURAN-CORRETJER, S.L., Paseo de Gracia, 101 E-08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 91500089.7 | 02.08.1991 | [1993/05] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525273 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0525273 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49, G01N33/86, G01N11/10 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
G01N33/4905 (EP);
G01N33/86 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Gerinnungszeit von Blut und Plasma | [1993/05] | English: | Process and apparatus for the determination of the coagulation time of blood and plasma | [1993/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déterminer le temps de coagulation du sang | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57000552 ; | [A]DE3540661 ; | [A]FR2318421 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 59 (P-110)(937) 16 April 1982 & JP-A-57 000 552 ( KOUWA K. K. ) 5 January 1982, & JP57000552 A 19820105 |