EP0531598 - 1,4-Dihydropyridines with paf-antagonistic activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALTER, S.A. Mateo Inurria, 30 E-28036 Madrid / ES | [1993/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sunkel, Carlos Almarza, 47 E-28033 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Fau de Casa-Juana, Miguel Torquemada, 17 E-28043 Madrid / ES | 03 /
Santos, Luis Conde de Penalver, 32 E-28006 Madrid / ES | 04 /
Ortega, Pilar Avda. de Pio XII, 97 bis E-28036 Madrid / ES | 05 /
Priego, Jaime Avda. Moratalaz, 66 E-28030 Madrid / ES | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 E-28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 91500103.6 | 09.09.1991 | [1993/11] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531598 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/90, C07D405/12, A61K31/44 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
C07D211/90 (EP,KR);
C07D211/80 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | 1,4-Dihydropyridine mit PAF-antagonistischer Aktivität | [1993/11] | English: | 1,4-Dihydropyridines with paf-antagonistic activity | [1993/11] | French: | 1,4-Dihydropyridines à activité PAF-antagoniste | [1993/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0001769 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0249245 (SYNTEX LAB [FR]); | [A]EP0325187 (ALTER SA [ES]) |