EP0447348 - Child proof lid for a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLEANTABS A/S Englandsvej 12 DK-8450 Hammel / DK | [1993/24] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states VIKING INDUSTRIES LIMITED 3 Kelso Crescent Moorebank, N.S.W. 2170 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eriksen, Jorgen Bonde 8, Vestbirkvej, Gammelstrup DK-8740 Braedstrup / DK | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Jensen, Peter Kim, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Jensen, Peter Kim, et al c/o Chas. Hude H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 DK-1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 91610018.3 | 14.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | DK19900000692 | 16.03.1990 Original published format: DK 69290 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0447348 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447348 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/02, B65D55/02 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
B65D43/02 (EP);
B65D50/06 (EP);
B65D2543/00037 (EP);
B65D2543/00166 (EP);
B65D2543/00296 (EP);
B65D2543/0049 (EP);
B65D2543/00546 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/38] | Title | German: | Kindersicherer Deckel für einen Behälter | [1991/38] | English: | Child proof lid for a container | [1991/38] | French: | Fermeture de sécurité pour récipient | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3643603 ; | [A]DE645930 ; | [A]GB164617 |