Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04255534 | Global Dossier | 10.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US57283990 | 27.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0473537 | Global Dossier | 05.10.1994 | B1 | EP0473537 | 04.03.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57283990 | 27.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2048988 | 27.11.2001 | C | CA2048988 | 28.02.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57283990 | 27.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69104446T | 09.02.1995 | T2 | DE69104446D1 | 10.11.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US57283990 | 27.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5114115 | 19.05.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US57283990 | 27.08.1990 |