Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] |
09.08.1993 | First examination report | |
31.10.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] |
31.05.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] |
31.05.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] |