EP0455602 - Holder for audio record carrier envelopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gyger, Peter Bodmerstrasse 12 B CH-3645 Gwatt/Thun / CH | [1991/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Kerr, Andrew A.KERR AG Postfach 444 Finkelerweg 44 4144 Arlesheim / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | Kerr, Andrew A.KERR AG Postfach 444 Finkelerweg 44 CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810324.3 | 29.04.1991 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | CH19900001493 | 03.05.1990 Original published format: CH 149390 | [1991/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455602 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/04, G11B23/02 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
G11B23/02 (EP);
G11B33/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/45] | Title | German: | Halter für Tonträger-Hüllen | [1991/45] | English: | Holder for audio record carrier envelopes | [1991/45] | French: | Réceptacle pour enveloppes à support d'enregistrement audio | [1991/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 26.04.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0277407 ; | [A]US4707247 ; | [A]US4793477 ; | [A]AT291768B ; | [A]EP0289329 ; | [A]FR2375687 ; | [A]FR2428299 |