Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU657224B | Global Dossier | 02.03.1995 | B2 | AU4124293 | 23.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US89807292 | 12.06.1992 | US5667993 | 03.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5383448 | 24.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US89807292 | 12.06.1992 | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 | US5667993 | 03.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05184559 | Global Dossier | 27.07.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU654711B | Global Dossier | 17.11.1994 | B2 | AU1732192 | 17.12.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0517990 | Global Dossier | 10.03.1999 | B1 | EP0517990 | 16.12.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE177327T | 15.03.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2068498 | 13.12.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69130979T | 04.05.2000 | T2 | DE69130979D1 | 15.04.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2131508T | 01.08.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3030499T | 29.10.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5207623 | 04.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP91810445 | 12.06.1991 |