EP0517990 - Ergometric device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRADOTEC S.A. Chemin des Coquelicots 16 1214 Vernier / CH | [1999/10] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states TRADOTEC S.A. Chemin des Coquelicots 16 CH-1214 Vernier / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tkatchouk, Elena N. Ul. Delegatskaya 16/1, ap. 134 103473 Moscow / SU | 02 /
Tsyganova, Tatiana N. Ul. Pervomayskaya 87, ap. 30 105077 Moscow / SU | 03 /
Murashov, Mikhail V. Altufierskoye shosse 24V, ap. 436 127562 Moscow / SU | 04 /
Staebler, Regula Chemin des Coquelicots 16 CH-1214 Vernier / CH | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Charbonnier, Georges R. Avenue de Miremont 11 1206 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Charbonnier, Georges R. 8, Avenue Peschier CH-1206 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810445.6 | 12.06.1991 | [1992/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517990 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517990 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A63B23/18 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
A61M16/0045 (EP,US);
A61M16/12 (EP,US);
A63B23/18 (EP,US);
A61M16/107 (EP,US);
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M2016/003 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0208 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0266 (EP,US);
A63B2213/006 (EP,US);
A63B2230/04 (EP,US);
A63B2230/06 (EP,US);
A63B2230/30 (EP,US);
Y10S482/90 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | Ergometrische Vorrichtung | [1992/51] | English: | Ergometric device | [1992/51] | French: | Dispositif ergométrique | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1993 | 30.06.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.1994 | 30.06.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 30.06.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1996 | 30.06.1997 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.1997 | 30.06.1998 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.03.1999 | GB | 10.03.1999 | GR | 10.03.1999 | DK | 10.06.1999 | AT | 12.06.1999 | LU | 12.06.1999 | ES | 14.06.1999 | BE | 30.06.1999 | CH | 30.06.1999 | LI | 30.06.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/37] | FR | 10.03.1999 | |
GB | 10.03.1999 | ||
GR | 10.03.1999 | ||
DK | 10.06.1999 | ||
AT | 12.06.1999 | ||
ES | 14.06.1999 | ||
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | FR | 10.03.1999 | |
GB | 10.03.1999 | ||
GR | 10.03.1999 | ||
DK | 10.06.1999 | ||
AT | 12.06.1999 | ||
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/32] | FR | 10.03.1999 | |
GB | 10.03.1999 | ||
GR | 10.03.1999 | ||
AT | 12.06.1999 | ||
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GB | 10.03.1999 | |
GR | 10.03.1999 | ||
AT | 12.06.1999 | ||
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | GB | 10.03.1999 | |
AT | 12.06.1999 | ||
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/05] | GB | 10.03.1999 | |
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 30.06.1999 | |
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | BE | 30.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN1037661 ; | [A]DE3121868 (HENKIN MELVYN LANE [US]); | [A]US4634117 (KRAMER PETER G [US]); | [Y]WO8907465 (HOEFER JUERGEN [DE]) | [Y] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Section PQ, Week 9037, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class P36, AN 90-275555 & CN-A-1 037 661 (G JIANG) 6 Décembre 1989, & CN1037661 A 00000000 |