EP0462934 - Receptacle with cases fixed side by side [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bürgi, Xaver Jurastrasse 9 Aarau / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/52] | For all designated states Bürgi, Xaver Jurastrasse 9 CH-Aarau / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/52] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/52] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810471.2 | 19.06.1991 | [1991/52] | Priority number, date | CH19900002055 | 20.06.1990 Original published format: CH 205590 | [1991/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462934 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B42F7/00, B42F17/00 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
B42F7/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1991/52] | Title | German: | Behälter mit aneinandergereihten Abteilen | [1991/52] | English: | Receptacle with cases fixed side by side | [1991/52] | French: | Récipient avec casiers disposés les uns à côté des autres | [1991/52] | File destroyed: | 21.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/08] | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2044349 ; | [A]FR2622148 ; | [A]FR2403279 ; | [A]DE1611035 |