EP0465414 - Device for the control of a flow of tobacco before trimming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABRIQUES DE TABAC REUNIES S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 P.O. Box 11 2003 Neuchâtel-Serrières / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states FABRIQUES DE TABAC REUNIES S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 P.O. Box 11 CH-2003 Neuchâtel-Serrières / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beguin, Jean-Jacques Grand-Rue 6 CH-2056 Dombresson / CH | 02 /
Vuilleumier, David Fbg. de l'Hôpital 37 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Franz, et al IPTO S.A. P.O. Box 594 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Fischer, Franz Joseph, et al c/o Bovard AG Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810480.3 | 20.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | CH19900002121 | 26.06.1990 Original published format: CH 212190 | [1992/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465414 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465414 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/18 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
A24C5/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/02] | Title | German: | Kontrollvorrichtung eines Tabakstromes vor Egalisierung | [1992/02] | English: | Device for the control of a flow of tobacco before trimming | [1992/02] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'un flux de tabac avant écrêtage | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 21.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1336960 (MOLINS MACHINE CO LTD); | [A]GB2072483 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) | Examination | DE3407893 | EP0259071 |