EP0465417 - Direct vision prostate balloon catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meadox Medicals, Inc. 112 Bauer Drive Oakland New Jersey 07436 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states Meadox Medicals, Inc. 112 Bauer Drive Oakland New Jersey 07436 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudnick, James J. 456 Optawa Avenue Hasbrouck Heights New Jersey 07604 / US | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy Pauline, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy P., Dipl.-Chem., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810488.6 | 24.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | US19900542869 | 25.06.1990 Original published format: US 542869 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465417 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465417 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/02 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
A61M29/02 (EP,US);
A61M2210/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/02] | Title | German: | Ballonkatheter zur direkten Betrachtung der Prostata | [1992/02] | English: | Direct vision prostate balloon catheter | [1992/02] | French: | Cathéter à ballon pour l'observation directe de la prostate | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.1995 | GR | 26.07.1995 | [2000/05] |
Former [1996/14] | AT | 26.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]FR2380786 (HANECKA LUBOMIR [AT]); | [A]EP0289021 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]); | [X]WO8911890 (ADVANCED SURGICAL INTERVENTION [US]); | [YD]EP0341988 |