EP0471647 - Restriction-deficient mutants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schurter, Walter, Dr. Burgfeldermattweg 57 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 02 /
Reinhard, Christina Bruckmühlenweg 10 W-7815 Kirchzarten / DE | 03 /
Mathé, Danièle 39, Rud d'Istein F-68870 Bartenheim la Chaussée / FR | [1992/08] | Application number, filing date | 91810617.0 | 07.08.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | CH19900002660 | 16.08.1990 Original published format: CH 266090 | [1992/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0471647 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0471647 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/75, C12N1/21, C12N15/87, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:07),(C12N1/21, C12R1:085) | [1992/08] | CPC: |
C12N9/22 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP);
C12N15/75 (EP);
C12R2001/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | Restriktionsdefiziente Mutante | [1992/08] | English: | Restriction-deficient mutants | [1992/08] | French: | Mutants déficients dans le système de restriction | [1992/08] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 01.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/36] | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0120629 (UNIV DELAWARE [US]); | [AD]EP0342633 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | [AD] - FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS Bd. 49, 1988, AMSTERDAM, NL Seiten 101 - 105 VEHMAANPER[, J. 'Transformation of Bacillus amyloliquefaciens protoplasts with plasmid DNA' |