EP0481922 - Method and apparatus for piecing slivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howa Machinery, Ltd. 32-3, Meieki 2-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states HOWA MACHINERY, LTD. 32-3, Meieki 2-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Yuhei 24, Yamabuki-cho, 6-chome Gifu-shi, Gifu / JP | 02 /
Nishimura, Shinzo 26-12 Aza Nakase, Meichi Bisai-shi, Aichi / JP | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Savoye, Jean-Paul Moinas & Savoye S.A. 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Savoye, Jean-Paul Moinas Kiehl Savoye & Cronin 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | ||
Former [1995/30] | Savoye, Jean-Paul Moinas Kiehl Savoye & Cronin 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge / CH | ||
Former [1992/17] | Dousse, Blasco 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810797.0 | 16.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | JP19900280595 | 18.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28059590 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481922 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481922 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D01H15/00 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
D01H15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1992/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Faserbandansetzen | [1992/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for piecing slivers | [1992/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour rattacher des mèches | [1992/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1996/28] | DE | 21.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0107339 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]); | [A]EP0303577 (GAUDINO PIERO & C SAS [IT]) |