EP0483064 - Machining centre for grinding workpieces with complex formed surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK LIECHTI & CO. AG Kanalweg CH-3550 Langnau im Emmental / CH | [1992/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liechti, Kurt Kanalweg 2 CH-3550 Langnau im Emmental / CH | 02 /
Liechti, Ralph Gurtenweg 45 CH-3074 Muri / CH | 03 /
Fritz, Lehmann Halden 579 CH-3550 Langnau im Emmental / CH | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Franz, et al IPTO S.A. P.O. Box 594 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Fischer, Franz Joseph, et al c/o Bovard AG Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810804.4 | 18.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | CH19900003416 | 25.10.1990 Original published format: CH 341690 | [1992/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483064 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483064 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B24B21/00, B24B19/14, B24B45/00, B24B41/00 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
B24B21/165 (EP,US);
B23Q3/15506 (EP,US);
B24B19/14 (EP,US);
B24B41/002 (EP,US);
B24B45/003 (EP,US);
Y10T483/174 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/18] | Title | German: | Bearbeitungszentrum zum Schleifen von Werkstücken mit komplex geformten Oberflächen | [1992/18] | English: | Machining centre for grinding workpieces with complex formed surfaces | [1992/18] | French: | Centre d'usinage pour le meulage de pièces ayant des surfaces de forme complexe | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0165143 (BERTHIEZ SAINT ETIENNE [FR]); | [A]EP0318966 (GRIESHABER MASCH [DE]); | [A]FR2629747 (BULA FILS SA [CH]); | [A]US4958463 (HESS ARTHUR E [US], et al) |