EP0534036 - Method and apparatus for wet treamtent of tubular textile materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1997 [1997/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLIPAT AG Chamerstrasse 79 CH-6300 Zug / CH | [1993/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strahm, Christian Himmelrich 32 CH-9552 Bronschhofen / CH | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Wenger, René, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Wenger, René, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Marktgasse 18 CH-9500 Wil / CH | ||
Former [1993/13] | Werffeli, Heinz R., Dipl.-Ing.ETH. Postfach 275 Waldgartenstrasse 12 CH-8125 Zürich-Zollikerberg / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810829.1 | 28.10.1991 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | CH19910002812 | 23.09.1991 Original published format: CH 281291 | [1993/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534036 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534036 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D06B3/10, D06B3/26 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
D06B3/105 (EP,US);
D06B3/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Nassbehandlung textiler Schlauchware und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1996/02] | English: | Method and apparatus for wet treamtent of tubular textile materials | [1993/13] | French: | Procédé et appareil de traitement par voie humide de matières textiles tubulaires | [1993/13] |
Former [1993/13] | Verfahren zur Nassbehandlung textiler Schlauchware, Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens und Anwendung des Verfahrens | Examination procedure | 08.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 10.04.1996 | [1996/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1267654 (BENTELER WERKE AG); | [A]DE1271070 (KLEINEWEFERS SOEHNE J); | [A]DE2139138 (KRANTZ H FA); | [A]EP0139995 (BRUECKNER APPARATEBAU GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2595726 (ABS SOBRINHO JOSE [BR]); | [A]EP0249022 (BRUECKNER APPARATEBAU GMBH [DE]) |