Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0454627 | Global Dossier | 16.12.1992 | A3 | EP0454627 | 30.10.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IT4520390 | 26.02.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1247599 | 28.12.1994 | B | IT9045203 | 26.08.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT4520390 | 26.02.1990 |