EP0493332 - Automatic machine for fashioning, filling and sealing gusseted plastic bags, in particular for packaging inert materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMES S.r.l. Via Santarcangiolese, 2050 I-47038 Santarcangelo di Romagna (Forli) / IT | [1992/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forni, Angelo Via Veneto, 36 I-47036 Riccione (Forli) / IT | 02 /
Tassoni, Vittorio Via Campanella, 62 I-40026 Imola (Bologna) / IT | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Pederzini, Paolo Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Pederzini, Paolo c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via dei Mille, 19 I-40121 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 91830546.7 | 06.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | IT19900003783 | 21.12.1990 Original published format: IT 378390 | [1992/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0493332 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/02, B31B23/00 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
B65B1/02 (EP);
B31B70/00 (EP);
B31B2155/00 (EP);
B31B2155/002 (EP);
B31B2160/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | Automatische Maschine zur Herstellung, zum Befüllen und zum Versiegeln von Kunststoff-Seitenfaltenbeuteln, insbesondere für das Verpacken von inerten Materialien | [1992/27] | English: | Automatic machine for fashioning, filling and sealing gusseted plastic bags, in particular for packaging inert materials | [1992/27] | French: | Machine automatique pour la fabrication, le remplissage et le scellage de sacs à soufflers en matière plastique, spécialement pour l'emballage de matériaux inertes | [1992/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/50] | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2676442 (GAUBERT RENE J); | [A]GB944776 (HESSER AG MASCHF); | [A]US3372625 (SIMECEK THOMAS E, et al); | [A]FR2309404 (HAVER & BOECKER [DE]); | [A]EP0397099 (BL MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE [IT]) |