EP0457744 - Method and arrangement for automatic selection of speed range in an electrically controlled pre-gearbox of a tractor or equivalent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALMET TRAKTORI OY Tourulantie 12 40100 Jyväskylä / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1994/36] | For all designated states VALMET TRAKTORI OY Tourulantie 12 SF-40100 Jyväskylä / FI | ||
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states Valmet Oy Punanotkonkatu 2 SF-00130 Helsinki 13 / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huuskonen, Pekka Lohdonmutka 4 SF-40420 Jyskä / FI | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Wallin, Bo-Göran, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Wallin, Bo-Göran, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 91850121.4 | 10.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | FI19900002399 | 14.05.1990 Original published format: FI 902399 | [1991/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457744 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457744 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, F16H63/44, F16H59/66 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
B60K28/165 (EP);
F16H61/702 (EP);
F16H2300/18 (EP);
F16H59/18 (EP);
F16H59/36 (EP);
F16H59/66 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/47] | F16H61/02, F16H63/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung für die automatische Auswahl eines Getriebeganges in einem elektrisch kontrollierten Vorschaltgetriebe eines Traktors oder ähnlichem | [1991/47] | English: | Method and arrangement for automatic selection of speed range in an electrically controlled pre-gearbox of a tractor or equivalent | [1991/47] | French: | Méthode et arrangement pour la sélection automatique d'une vitesse dans une pré-boîte à vitesse contrôlée électriquement pour un tracteur ou pareil | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 13.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.10.1994 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4319501 (SUGIMOTO HIROSHI); | [A]GB2154679 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]EP0240901 ; | [AP]US4967355 (IWATSUKI KUNIHIRO [JP], et al) |