EP0479746 - Rifled fiber reinforced gun barrel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STATOIL EUROPARTS AB Box 302 S-341 26 Ljungby / SE | [1992/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oskarsson, Leif Mjäryd S-341 91 Ljungby / SE | 02 /
Andersson, Sigge Björnbärsvägen 18 S-341 34 Ljungby / SE | 03 /
Pettersson, Bengt Berghem 1056 S-341 91 Ljungby / SE | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Holmgren, Hans Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | Holmgren, Hans Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1992/15] | Falk, Bengt Bofors AB Patents and Trademarks S-691 80 Karlskoga / SE | Application number, filing date | 91850231.1 | 26.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | SE19900003119 | 01.10.1990 Original published format: SE 9003119 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479746 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479746 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F41A21/02, F41A21/18, B29C53/82, B29C70/00 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
F41A21/18 (EP,US);
B29C53/821 (EP,US);
B29C70/083 (EP,US);
B29C70/085 (EP,US);
B29C70/56 (EP,US);
F41A21/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/15] | F41A21/02, F41A21/18, B29C53/82, B29C67/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/15] | Title | German: | Faserverstärkter gezogener Gewehrlauf | [1992/15] | English: | Rifled fiber reinforced gun barrel | [1992/15] | French: | Tube de canon rayé renforcé par des fibres | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.1996 | BE | 31.01.1996 | CH | 31.01.1996 | DK | 31.01.1996 | ES | 31.01.1996 | FR | 31.01.1996 | GR | 31.01.1996 | IT | 31.01.1996 | LI | 31.01.1996 | NL | 31.01.1996 | LU | 30.09.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 31.01.1996 | |
BE | 31.01.1996 | ||
CH | 31.01.1996 | ||
DK | 31.01.1996 | ||
ES | 31.01.1996 | ||
FR | 31.01.1996 | ||
GR | 31.01.1996 | ||
IT | 31.01.1996 | ||
LI | 31.01.1996 | ||
NL | 31.01.1996 | ||
LU | 30.09.1996 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 31.01.1996 | |
BE | 31.01.1996 | ||
CH | 31.01.1996 | ||
DK | 31.01.1996 | ||
ES | 31.01.1996 | ||
GR | 31.01.1996 | ||
IT | 31.01.1996 | ||
LI | 31.01.1996 | ||
NL | 31.01.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
LU | 30.09.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 31.01.1996 | |
BE | 31.01.1996 | ||
CH | 31.01.1996 | ||
DK | 31.01.1996 | ||
ES | 31.01.1996 | ||
GR | 31.01.1996 | ||
IT | 31.01.1996 | ||
LI | 31.01.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
LU | 30.09.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 31.01.1996 | |
BE | 31.01.1996 | ||
CH | 31.01.1996 | ||
DK | 31.01.1996 | ||
GR | 31.01.1996 | ||
IT | 31.01.1996 | ||
LI | 31.01.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
LU | 30.09.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 31.01.1996 | |
BE | 31.01.1996 | ||
CH | 31.01.1996 | ||
DK | 31.01.1996 | ||
IT | 31.01.1996 | ||
LI | 31.01.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 31.01.1996 | |
BE | 31.01.1996 | ||
CH | 31.01.1996 | ||
DK | 31.01.1996 | ||
LI | 31.01.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 31.01.1996 | |
BE | 31.01.1996 | ||
CH | 31.01.1996 | ||
LI | 31.01.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
Former [1997/04] | AT | 31.01.1996 | |
BE | 31.01.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | AT | 31.01.1996 | |
BE | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 31.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3517585 (SLADE EDWIN); | [A]US3571962 (EIG MERRILL); | [A]US4486375 (HIRAI HIDEO [JP]); | [Y]EP0170353 (UNITED KINGDOM GOVERNMENT [CA]); | [A]FR2587083 (LERC LAB ETUDES RECH CHIM [FR]) |