EP0464018 - Process for producing N-phosphonomethylglycine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167 / US | ||
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fields, Donald Lee, Jr. 406 Stephanie Lane Manchester, Missouri 63011 / US | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 91870014.7 | 24.01.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | US19900543016 | 25.06.1990 Original published format: US 543016 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464018 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464018 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38, A01N57/20, B01J23/24 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
C07F9/3813 (EP,US);
C07F9/44 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-Phosphonmethylglyzin | [1992/01] | English: | Process for producing N-phosphonomethylglycine | [1992/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation de N-phosphonométhylglycine | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/29] | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 04.10.1995 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]HU29642 ; | [Y]EP0314662 (MONSANTO CO [US]) | [Y] - WORLD PATENT INDEX (ONLINE), ACCESSION NO. 84-090 799, DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, Abstract; & HU-A-29 642 (MTA KOZPONTI KEMIAI)., & HU29642 A 00000000 | Examination | HU187347 | EP0439445 |