EP0451130 - Use of amiloride and other pyrazine derivatives for preventing or treating ocular neovascularization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELTRIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 3055 Patrick Henry Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054-1815 / US | [1993/24] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states BALTIMORE BIOTECH, INC. St. Joeseph's Hospital, 7620 York Road Towson, Maryland 21204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glaser, Bert M. 11201 Valley Heights Drive Owings Mills, Maryland 21117 / US | 02 /
Varner, Hugh H. 318 Ringold Valley Circle Cockeysville, Maryland 21030 / US | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1991/41] | Colens, Alain Rue Frans Merjay, 21 B-1060 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 91870055.0 | 04.04.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | US19900504584 | 05.04.1990 Original published format: US 504584 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0451130 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0451130 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Amilorid und anderen Pyrazin-Derivaten zur Prophylaxe und Behandlung von Neovaskularisierung im Auge | [1991/41] | English: | Use of amiloride and other pyrazine derivatives for preventing or treating ocular neovascularization | [1991/41] | French: | Utilisation d'amiloride et d'autres dérivés de pyrazine dans la prévention et le traitement de néovascularisation oculaire | [1991/41] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 07.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/37] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9009792 | [YD] - ANTICANCER RESEARCH, vol. 8, 1988, pages 1373-1376; J.A: KELLEN et al.: "Antimetastatic effect of amiloride in an animal tumour model" | [YD] - FEBS LETTERS, vol. 214, no. 1, 1987, pages 187-191, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (Biomedical Division); J.-D. VASSALLI et al.: "Amiloride selectively inhibits the urokinase-type plasminogen activator" | [Y] - INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., vol. 30, suppl., 1989, page 395, abstract no. 27; B.M. GLASER et al.: "A urokinase inhibitor derived from human RPE cells inhibits neovascularization in vivo" | [YD] - INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., vol. 22, no. 2, February 1982, pages 191-199, ASSOC. FOR RES. IN VIS. AND OPHTHAL., INC.; M. BERMAN et al.: "Plasminogen activator (urokinase) causes vascularization of the cornea" | [XP] - ARCH. OPHTHALMOL., vol. 108, no. 10, October 1990, pages 1474-1476; R.L. AVERY et al.: "Systemic amiloride inhibits experimentally induced neovascularization" |