Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] |
03.01.1994 | First examination report | |
05.08.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.09.1992 [1992/39] |
20.12.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] |