EP0490863 - Surface-modified support membrane and process therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.04.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stedronsky, Erwin Raymond 1247 Hampton Park Drive Richmond Heights, Missouri 63117 / US | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Ernst, Hubert, et al Monsanto Services International S.A./N.V. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No. 21 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Ernst, Hubert, et al Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No. 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 91870200.2 | 09.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | US19900627093 | 13.12.1990 Original published format: US 627093 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490863 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/36, B01D67/00 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
B01D67/0088 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Oberflächenmodifizierte Trägermembran und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1992/25] | English: | Surface-modified support membrane and process therefor | [1992/25] | French: | Membrane support modifiée en surface et procédé de préparation | [1992/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1995/23] | 19.01.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0221046 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [A]EP0111714 (ALIGENA AG [CH]); | [A]EP0386784 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0344799 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |