EP0493357 - Method for physico-chemically purifying contaminated sediments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILT N.V. Haven 1025 Scheldedijk 30 B-2070 Zwijndrecht / BE | [1994/14] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states "Dredging International" Scheldedijk, 30 B-2730 Zwijndrecht / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goemaere, Inge Brugstraat 37 B-9270 Kalken / BE | 02 /
De Proost, Victor Ferd. Verbiestlaan 46 B-2650 Edegem / BE | 03 /
D'Heane, Siegfried Rooberg 1 B-9860 Landskouter / BE | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 91870213.5 | 19.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | BE19900001236 | 21.12.1990 Original published format: BE 9001236 | [1992/27] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0493357 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493357 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, C02F1/26, C02F11/00 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
B09C1/02 (EP);
C02F1/26 (EP);
C02F1/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1992/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum physisch-chemischen Reinigen von kontaminierten Sedimenten | [1992/27] | English: | Method for physico-chemically purifying contaminated sediments | [1992/27] | French: | Procédé pour le nettoyage physico-chimique de sediments contaminés | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.02.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/52] | FR | 13.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0072885 ; | [AD]EP0161698 ; | [A]US4336136 ; | [A]EP0325159 ; | [A]WO8802285 ; | [A]WO8905778 ; | [A]EP0347965 | [YD] - 'Handboek bodemsaneringstechnieken' May 1988 , STAATSUITGEVERIJ , THE HAGUE NL |