EP0471661 - Apparatus for assembling of plates and separators into plate groups for storage batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELBAK Batteriewerke Gesellschaft m.b.H. Puntigamer Strasse 127 A-8055 Graz-Puntigam Steiermark / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states ELBAK Batteriewerke Gesellschaft m.b.H. Puntigamer Strasse 127 A-8055 Graz-Puntigam Steiermark / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puhm, Helmut Dr. Robert Grafstrasse 10 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Kirstein, Wilhelm H. Paradisgasse 55 A-1190 Wien / AT | 03 /
Schwetz, Anton Nörning 72 A-8273 Ebersdorf / AT | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | Beer, Manfred, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | Beer, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lindengasse 8 A-1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890116.6 | 29.05.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | AT19900001686 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: AT 168690 | [1992/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471661 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471661 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/14 | [1992/08] | CPC: |
H01M10/0404 (EP);
H01M10/14 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zusammensetzen von Platten und Separatoren zu Plattensätzen für Akkumulatoren | [1992/08] | English: | Apparatus for assembling of plates and separators into plate groups for storage batteries | [1992/08] | French: | Dispositif pour l'assemblage de plaques et de séparateurs en blocs de plaques pour accumulateurs | [1992/08] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 02.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Request for further processing for: | 15.11.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2207488 ; | [AD]DE1160910 ; | [AD]DE935374 (ELECTRIC STORAGE BATTERY CO) | Examination | DE935574 |