EP0534042 - Angle insert assembly for pressure fluid hoses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEBER, Gisela Hauptplatz 23 A-2474 Gattendorf / AT | [1993/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Holzer, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Schütz u. Partner Brigittenauer Lände 50 1200 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Holzer, Walter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schütz und Partner, Fleischmanngasse 9 A-1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890223.0 | 23.09.1991 | [1993/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534042 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16L27/08 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
F16L27/093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | Winkel-Einpressnippelanordnung für Druckmediumschläuche | [1993/13] | English: | Angle insert assembly for pressure fluid hoses | [1993/13] | French: | Assemblage angulaire à enfoncement pour tuyaux souples à vide | [1993/13] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/27] | 01.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.11.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2555869 ; | [A]US3219366 ; | [A]DE2439527 ; | [A]GB1022572 ; | [A]EP0004249 ; | [A]EP0215318 ; | [A]EP0300327 |