EP0486464 - Device for forming a bale like body with dimensional stability of thin-spun material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schrenk, Hannes Schneeberggasse 10 A-2700 Wiener Neustadt / AT | [1992/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Itze, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Wilhelm Casati & Peter Itze Amerlingstrasse 8 1061 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Itze, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Itze, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Amerlingstrasse 8 A-1061 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890273.5 | 12.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | AT19900002288 | 13.11.1990 Original published format: AT 228890 | [1992/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486464 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/08, B65D90/40 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
B21D51/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Formen formbeständiger ballenartiger Formkörper aus dünnfasrigem Material | [1992/21] | English: | Device for forming a bale like body with dimensional stability of thin-spun material | [1992/21] | French: | Dispositif pour former des corps à stabilité dimensionnelle en forme de balle en matière à fils fins | [1992/21] | File destroyed: | 23.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/45] | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0342608 ; | [A]CH619416 ; | [A]DE680737 |