EP0486466 - Method for controlling the aerobic decomposition of organic wastes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE MONTAGE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Dieselstrasse 2 A-4600 Wels Oberösterreich / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE MONTAGE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Dieselstrasse 2 A-4600 Wels Oberösterreich / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zobernig, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Harterfeldstrasse 3/4 A-4060 Leonding / AT | 02 /
Höchtel, Franz, Ing. Fliederstrasse 21 A-4600 Wels / AT | 03 /
Hochmayr, Franz Ghegastrasse 32 A-4600 Wels / AT | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Itze, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Wilhelm Casati & Peter Itze Amerlingstrasse 8 1061 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Itze, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Itze, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Amerlingstrasse 8 A-1061 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890279.2 | 14.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | AT19900002327 | 16.11.1990 Original published format: AT 232790 | [1992/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486466 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486466 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C05F17/00 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
C05F17/15 (EP);
C05F17/20 (EP);
C05F17/70 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum kontrollierten und gesteuerten aeroben biologischen Abbau von organischen Abfällen | [1992/21] | English: | Method for controlling the aerobic decomposition of organic wastes | [1992/21] | French: | Méthode de contrôle de la décomposition aérobique des matériaux organiques de déchet | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 15.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.04.1995 | DK | 12.04.1995 | ES | 12.04.1995 | FR | 12.04.1995 | GR | 12.04.1995 | IT | 12.04.1995 | NL | 12.04.1995 | SE | 12.07.1995 | AT | 14.11.1995 | GB | 14.11.1995 | CH | 30.11.1995 | LI | 30.11.1995 | LU | 30.11.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/11] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
ES | 12.04.1995 | ||
GR | 12.04.1995 | ||
IT | 12.04.1995 | ||
NL | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
AT | 14.11.1995 | ||
GB | 14.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
ES | 12.04.1995 | ||
GR | 12.04.1995 | ||
IT | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
AT | 14.11.1995 | ||
GB | 14.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
GR | 12.04.1995 | ||
IT | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
AT | 14.11.1995 | ||
GB | 14.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
GR | 12.04.1995 | ||
IT | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
AT | 14.11.1995 | ||
GB | 14.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
IT | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
AT | 14.11.1995 | ||
GB | 14.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
AT | 14.11.1995 | ||
GB | 14.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/28] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
AT | 14.11.1995 | ||
GB | 14.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/16] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
AT | 14.11.1995 | ||
GB | 14.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/47] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
GB | 14.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
FR | 08.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | FR | 08.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2268896 ; | [Y]US3138448 (LUDWIG SCHULZE KARL); | [A]US4384878 (NORDLUND TORE [SE], et al); | [A]EP0221219 (BIEZ GEORGES) | [Y] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Week 9050, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 90-372094 & JP-A-2 268 896 (NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION), & JP2268896 A 00000000 |