EP0487496 - Arrangement for laying a wire in circular windings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstr. 44 A-4020 Linz / AT | [1995/01] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GESELLSCHAFT m.b.H. Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ossoinig, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Oberbairingerstrasse 18 A-4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
Prinz, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Koloman Wallischstrasse 3/21 A-4400 Steyr / AT | 03 /
Schandl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Ramsauerstrasse 36 A-4020 Linz / AT | 04 /
Stadlbauer, Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Asangerweg 20 A-4040 Linz / AT | 05 /
Zeman, Klaus, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Kroatengasse 33 A-4020 Linz / AT | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Wolfram, Gustav, et al Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Wolfram, Gustav, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890284.2 | 18.11.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | AT19900002347 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: AT 234790 | [1992/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487496 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487496 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/14 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
B21C47/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/22] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Legen eines Drahtes in kreisförmige Windungen | [1992/22] | English: | Arrangement for laying a wire in circular windings | [1992/22] | French: | Dispositif pour poser un fil métallique en tours circulaires | [1992/22] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.04.1995 | DK | 05.04.1995 | ES | 05.04.1995 | FR | 05.04.1995 | GR | 05.04.1995 | NL | 05.04.1995 | CH | 30.11.1995 | LI | 30.11.1995 | LU | 30.11.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/11] | BE | 05.04.1995 | |
DK | 05.04.1995 | ||
ES | 05.04.1995 | ||
GR | 05.04.1995 | ||
NL | 05.04.1995 | ||
FR | 01.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 05.04.1995 | |
DK | 05.04.1995 | ||
ES | 05.04.1995 | ||
GR | 05.04.1995 | ||
FR | 01.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | BE | 05.04.1995 | |
DK | 05.04.1995 | ||
GR | 05.04.1995 | ||
FR | 01.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 05.04.1995 | |
DK | 05.04.1995 | ||
GR | 05.04.1995 | ||
FR | 01.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 05.04.1995 | |
DK | 05.04.1995 | ||
FR | 01.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/28] | BE | 05.04.1995 | |
FR | 01.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/05] | BE | 05.04.1995 | |
FR | 01.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | FR | 01.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2059115 ; | [A]JP62157178 ; | [A]JP62220218 ; | [A]FR1313211 ; | [A]DE2912162 (SALZGITTER PEINE STAHLWERKE) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 231 (M-97)16. Mai 1990 & JP-A-2 059 115 ( SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND. LTD. ) 28. Februar 1990, & JP2059115 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 388 (M-652)18. Dezember 1987 & JP-A-62 157 178 ( SUEKICHI SADOTOMO ) 13. Juli 1987, & JP62157178 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 78 (M-675)11. März 1988 & JP-A-62 220 218 ( NIPPON STEEL WELD PROD. & ENG. CO. LTD. ) 28. September 1987, & JP62220218 A 00000000 |