EP0487498 - Device for determining the density of liquids and gases from the period of an oscillator filled with a material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stabinger, Hans, Dr. Peterstalstrasse 156 A-8042 Graz / AT | For all designated states Leopold, Hans, O. Univ.-Prof. Dr. Sonnleitenweg 17 A-8043 Graz / AT | [1992/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/40] |
Former [1992/44] | 01 /
Leopold, Hans, O.Univ.-Prof.Dr. Sonnleitenweg 17 156 A-8043 Graz / AT | ||
02 /
Stabinger, Hans, Dr. Peterstalstrasse 156 A-8042 Graz / AT | |||
Former [1992/22] | 01 /
Stabinger, Hans, Dr. Peterstalstrasse 156 A-8042 Graz / AT | Representative(s) | Gibler, Ferdinand Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte OG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Gibler, Ferdinand, Dipl.Ing. Dr. techn. Dorotheergasse 7/14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890287.5 | 18.11.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | AT19900002377 | 22.11.1990 Original published format: AT 237790 | [1992/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487498 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0487498 | Date: | 30.10.1992 | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487498 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N9/00 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
G01N9/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Dichte von Flüssigkeiten und Gasen aus der Periodendauer eines mit einem Präparat gefüllten Schwingers | [1992/22] | English: | Device for determining the density of liquids and gases from the period of an oscillator filled with a material | [1992/22] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la densité de liquides de gaz à partir de la période d'un oscillateur rempli de matériau | [1992/22] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.10.1995 | DK | 04.10.1995 | ES | 04.10.1995 | FR | 04.10.1995 | GB | 04.10.1995 | GR | 04.10.1995 | IT | 04.10.1995 | NL | 04.10.1995 | LU | 30.11.1995 | SE | 04.01.1996 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/11] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
DK | 04.10.1995 | ||
ES | 04.10.1995 | ||
GB | 04.10.1995 | ||
GR | 04.10.1995 | ||
IT | 04.10.1995 | ||
NL | 04.10.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
FR | 01.03.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
DK | 04.10.1995 | ||
ES | 04.10.1995 | ||
GB | 04.10.1995 | ||
GR | 04.10.1995 | ||
IT | 04.10.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
FR | 01.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/27] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
DK | 04.10.1995 | ||
GB | 04.10.1995 | ||
GR | 04.10.1995 | ||
IT | 04.10.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
FR | 01.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
DK | 04.10.1995 | ||
GB | 04.10.1995 | ||
GR | 04.10.1995 | ||
IT | 04.10.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
FR | 01.03.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
DK | 04.10.1995 | ||
GB | 04.10.1995 | ||
IT | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
FR | 01.03.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
DK | 04.10.1995 | ||
GB | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
FR | 01.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/36] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
GB | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
FR | 01.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
GB | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | GB | 04.10.1995 | |
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 04.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1498548 (AUTOMATION PROD); | [A]FR2208525 (KRATKY OTTO DR DR E H [AT]); | [AD]AT356943B (KRATKY OTTO DIPL ING DR DR H C, et al); | [A]US4602498 (GLIKBERG SANTIAGO [IL], et al); | [A]GB2187286 (HATSCHEK RUDOLF); | [A]WO9012306 (INSTRULAB [FR]) |