EP0506963 - PRODUCTION OF HUMAN BASIC FGF MUTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1992/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITANO, Kazuaki 15-4, Akasakadai 4-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590-01 / JP | 02 /
KURIYAMA, Masato 1-38-512, Uchin-daicho 4-chome Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 534 / JP | 03 /
NISHIMURA, Osamu 54-16, Daiwanishi 1-chome Kawanishi-shi Hyogo 666-01 / JP | 04 /
IGARASHI, Koichi 66-3, Shimogamo-miyazakicho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606 / JP | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1992/41] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 91900328.5 | 18.12.1990 | [1992/41] | WO1990JP01646 | Priority number, date | JP19890330225 | 19.12.1989 Original published format: JP 33022589 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109126 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506963 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/16, C12N1/21, C12N15/70, C12N15/67 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
C07K14/503 (EP);
C12N1/16 (KR);
C12N15/67 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINES MUTEINS VON MENSCHLICHEM BASISCHEN FGF (FIBROBLASTENWACHSTUMSFAKTOR) | [1992/41] | English: | PRODUCTION OF HUMAN BASIC FGF MUTEIN | [1992/41] | French: | PRODUCTION D'UNE MUTEINE DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE FIBROBLASTIQUE BASIQUE DE L'HOMME | [1992/41] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 11.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 16.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0326907 [ ] (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | EP0320148 [ ] (AMGEN INC [US]); | EP0300425 [ ] (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | EP0178863 [ ] (SCHERING CORP [US]) |