EP0452480 - SPRAY CONVERSION PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF NANOPHASE COMPOSITE POWDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROCEDYNE CORPORATION 11 Industrial Drive New Brunswick NJ 08901 / US | For all designated states Rutgers, The State University of New Jersey 377 Hoes Lane Piscataway, NJ 08855-1179 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states PROCEDYNE CORPORATION 11 Industrial Drive New Brunswick, NJ 08901 / US | ||
For all designated states RUTGERS, THE STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW JERSEY 377 Hoes Lane Piscataway, NJ 08855-1179 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCANDLISH, Larry, E. 262 Lincoln Avenue Highland Park, NJ 08904 / US | 02 /
KEAR, Bernard, H. 10 Campbells Brook Road Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US | 03 /
BHATIA, SwarnJeet 2259 Shawnee Path Scotch Plains, NJ 07090 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91900465.5 | 02.11.1990 | [1991/43] | WO1990US06550 | Priority number, date | US19890433742 | 09.11.1989 Original published format: US 433742 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107244 | Date: | 30.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0452480 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B22F9/08 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
B22F9/08 (KR);
C22C1/056 (EP,US);
B01D1/18 (EP,US);
B01J8/1836 (EP,US);
B22F1/054 (EP,KR,US);
B22F9/026 (EP,US);
B22F9/22 (EP,US);
C01B13/185 (EP,US);
C22C1/059 (US);
B01J2208/00088 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00212 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00407 (EP,US);
B01J2208/0053 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2002/84 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F9/026, B22F2202/01 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, C22C1/056, B22F2202/15 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | SPRÜHUMWANDLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON VERBUNDPULVERN IN DER NANOPHASE | [1991/43] | English: | SPRAY CONVERSION PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF NANOPHASE COMPOSITE POWDERS | [1991/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONVERSION PAR PULVERISATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE POUDRES COMPOSITES EN PHASE NANOMETRIQUE | [1991/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1991 | Search fee paid | 17.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/21] | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0326861 (STARCK HERMANN C FA [DE]); | [XP]DE3835728 (NMI NATURWISSENSCHAFTL U MEDIZ [DE]) | International search | [Y]US3512962 (HOLTZ FREDERICK C JR); | [Y]US4320156 (OAKES JAMES J, et al) |