EP0502102 - A STARCH-DERIVED, FOOD-GRADE, INSOLUBLE BULKING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTA FOOD INGREDIENTS, INC. 64 Sydney Street, Fifth Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [1992/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IYENGAR, Radha 43 Flett Road Belmont, MA 02178 / US | 02 /
ZAKS, Aleksey 1454 Beacon Street, No. 442 Brookline, MA 02146 / US | 03 /
GROSS, Akiva 78 Vine Street Newton, MA 02167 / US | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91900500.9 | 21.11.1990 | [1992/37] | WO1990US06865 | Priority number, date | US19890440585 | 22.11.1989 Original published format: US 440585 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107106 | Date: | 30.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502102 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502102 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/308, C08B30/12, C12P19/14, A23L1/0522 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
A23G3/346 (EP,US);
A21D2/18 (EP,US);
A23G3/343 (EP,US);
A23G9/52 (EP,US);
A23L29/35 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01001 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01003 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01041 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23G3/343, A23G2200/06 (EP,US);
A23G3/346, A23G2200/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/37] | Title | German: | EIN UNLÖSLICHER FÜLLSTOFF AUS STÄRKE MIT NAHRUNGSMITTELQUALITÄT | [1992/37] | English: | A STARCH-DERIVED, FOOD-GRADE, INSOLUBLE BULKING AGENT | [1992/37] | French: | AGENT GONFLANT INSOLUBLE DERIVE DE L'AMIDON, DE QUALITE ALIMENTAIRE | [1992/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.1994 | DK | 13.07.1994 | ES | 13.07.1994 | GR | 13.07.1994 | IT | 13.07.1994 | SE | 13.10.1994 | LU | 30.11.1994 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 13.07.1994 | |
DK | 13.07.1994 | ||
ES | 13.07.1994 | ||
GR | 13.07.1994 | ||
IT | 13.07.1994 | ||
SE | 13.10.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 13.07.1994 | |
DK | 13.07.1994 | ||
GR | 13.07.1994 | ||
IT | 13.07.1994 | ||
SE | 13.10.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.07.1994 | |
DK | 13.07.1994 | ||
IT | 13.07.1994 | ||
SE | 13.10.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.07.1994 | |
DK | 13.07.1994 | ||
SE | 13.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 13.07.1994 | |
SE | 13.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 13.07.1994 | Cited in | International search | FR1559081 [ ]; | US3666557 [ ] (JENSEN EDWARD R, et al); | WO8909793 [ ] (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]); | WO9015147 [ ] (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) | [Y] - Carbohydrate Research, vol. 132, 1984, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., (Amsterdam, NL), J.-L. Jane et al.: "Structure studies of amylose-v complexes and retrograded amylose by action of alpha amylases, and new method for preparing amylodextrins", pages 105-118 | [A] - Cereal Chemistry, vol. 66, no. 4, 1989, D. Sievert et al.: "Enzyme-Resistant Starch. I. Characterization and evaluation by enzymatic, thermoanalytical, and microscopic methods", pages 342-347 | Examination | - Carbohydrate Research, vol.132,1984, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., (Amsterdam, NL), J.-L. Jane et al.: "Structure studies of amylose-v complexes and retrograded amylose by action of alpha amylases, and new method for preparing amylodextrins", pages 105-118, see abstract; page 108, lines 19-31; page 113; figure 7 (CITED IN THE APPLICATION) |