EP0511219 - LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATHIAS HOFFMANN DESIGN GmbH Beim Kupferhammer 5B D-72070 Tübingen / DE | [1992/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Mathias Viktor Renner Strasse 16 W-7400 Tübingen / DE | [1992/45] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/12] | Dreiss, Hosenthien, Fuhlendorf & Partner Gerokstrasse 6 D-70188 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1992/45] | Grabner, Hans-Joachim Strohberg 7-9 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 91900734.4 | 26.12.1990 | [1992/45] | WO1990DE00999 | Priority number, date | DE19904001641 | 20.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4001641 | [1992/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110863 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0511219 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0511219 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/02, F21V21/14 | [1992/45] | CPC: |
F21V21/112 (EP,US);
F21S2/00 (EP,US);
F21S6/003 (EP);
F21S8/06 (EP);
F21S8/081 (EP);
F21V21/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/45] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [1992/45] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE | [1992/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE | [1992/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 23.03.1994 | FR | 23.03.1994 | IT | 23.03.1994 | NL | 23.03.1994 | SE | 23.03.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 23.03.1994 | |
IT | 23.03.1994 | ||
NL | 23.03.1994 | ||
SE | 23.03.1994 | ||
FR | 12.08.1994 | ||
Former [2002/23] | IT | 23.03.1994 | |
NL | 23.03.1994 | ||
SE | 23.03.1994 | ||
FR | 12.08.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 23.03.1994 | |
NL | 23.03.1994 | ||
FR | 12.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | NL | 23.03.1994 | |
FR | 12.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/07] | FR | 12.08.1994 | Cited in | International search | DE3804008 [ ] (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE], et al); | US4689726 [ ] (KRETZSCHMAR THOMAS E [US]); | DE8915298U [ ]; | GB836163 [ ] (BEST & LLOYD LTD); | DE8905192U [ ] |