EP0502972 - COLLAPSIBLE BORDER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochrane, Ian Robert Whites Barn, Whitney Road Finstock Oxon 0X7 3DF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states Cochrane, Ian Robert Whites Barn, Whitney Road Finstock, Oxon 0X7 3DF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91900871.4 | 04.12.1990 | [1992/38] | WO1990GB01881 | Priority number, date | GB19890027376 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: GB 8927376 | GB19900012549 | 05.06.1990 Original published format: GB 9012549 | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107896 | Date: | 13.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502972 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502972 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47G1/06 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
A47G1/0644 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/14] |
Former [1992/38] | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENLEGBARER RAHMEN | [1992/38] | English: | COLLAPSIBLE BORDER ASSEMBLY | [1992/38] | French: | BORDURE D'ENCADREMENT PLIABLE | [1992/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Request for further processing for: | 09.05.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.05.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.03.1996 | ES | 06.03.1996 | FR | 06.03.1996 | IT | 06.03.1996 | LI | 06.03.1996 | NL | 06.03.1996 | SE | 06.06.1996 | DE | 08.06.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | CH | 06.03.1996 | |
ES | 06.03.1996 | ||
IT | 06.03.1996 | ||
LI | 06.03.1996 | ||
NL | 06.03.1996 | ||
SE | 06.06.1996 | ||
DE | 08.06.1996 | ||
FR | 02.08.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | CH | 06.03.1996 | |
ES | 06.03.1996 | ||
IT | 06.03.1996 | ||
LI | 06.03.1996 | ||
SE | 06.06.1996 | ||
DE | 08.06.1996 | ||
FR | 02.08.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 06.03.1996 | |
IT | 06.03.1996 | ||
LI | 06.03.1996 | ||
SE | 06.06.1996 | ||
DE | 08.06.1996 | ||
FR | 02.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | CH | 06.03.1996 | |
LI | 06.03.1996 | ||
SE | 06.06.1996 | ||
DE | 08.06.1996 | ||
FR | 02.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | SE | 06.06.1996 | |
DE | 08.06.1996 | ||
FR | 02.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | SE | 06.06.1996 | |
DE | 08.06.1996 | ||
Former [N/P] | deleted | Cited in | International search | [Y]CH670195 ; | [X]DE817395 (KAUTZ FRED); | [A]EP0188121 (RAINONE JOHN PHILIP [GB]); | [A]EP0193467 (STIVA STEPH SIMON EDITIONS SOC [FR]) |