EP0605409 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION AND CONCENTRATION IN A SUSPENSION USING ULTRASONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Malvern Instruments Limited Spring Lane South Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 1AT / GB | [1999/31] |
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBA, Felix 5760 South Ridge Creek Road Murrey, UT 84107 / US | [1994/28] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker, Brettell & Duncan, 138, Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [1994/28] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91901109.8 | 13.11.1990 | [1994/28] | WO1990US06469 | Priority number, date | US19890436153 | 13.11.1989 Original published format: US 436153 | [1994/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9107646 | Date: | 30.05.1991 | [1991/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0605409 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605409 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/00, G01N29/02 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
G01N29/032 (EP,US);
G01N15/02 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02416 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02809 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0421 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0422 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/28] | G01N15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Teilchen-Grössenverteilung und -Konzentration in einer Suspension unter Benutzung von Ultraschall. | [1994/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION AND CONCENTRATION IN A SUSPENSION USING ULTRASONICS | [1994/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR DETERMINER LA REPARTITION GRANULOMETRIQUE ET LA CONCENTRATION DANS UNE SUSPENSION EN UTILISANT DES ULTRASONS | [1994/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.04.1992 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 27.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.10.1996
16.01.1997
ADMISSIBLE Prof. Dr. Ulrich Riebel Dorfstrasse 35 D-03096 Briesen / DE Opponent's representative von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.10.1996
16.01.1997
ADMISSIBLE Prof. Dr. Ulrich Riebel Dorfstrasse 35 D-03096 Briesen / DE Opponent's representative von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.10.1996
Prof. Dr. Ulrich Riebel Dorfstrasse 35 D-03096 Briesen / DE Opponent's representative von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | 21.01.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.08.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.07.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.12.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 14.02.2001 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2001/21] | Appeal following opposition | 22.02.2000 | Appeal received No. T0287/00 | 11.04.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 14.02.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.02.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2163034 (AUTOMETRICS CO); | [A]US4412451 (UUSITALO SEPPO J [FI], et al); | [Y]US4706509 (RIEBEL ULRICH [DE]) |