05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
30.07.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
10.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
11.12.1999 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
25.11.1999 |
Revocation of patent |
|
23.11.1999 |
Change - appeal |
|
27.07.1999 |
Change - appeal number |
|
26.07.1999 |
Change - appeal |
|
08.07.1999 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
08.07.1999 |
Opposition rejected |
|
12.02.1999 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
10.06.1998 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
20.05.1998 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
25.03.1998 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
13.11.1997 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
17.10.1997 |
Opposition filed |
published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] |
16.10.1997 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
10.10.1997 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
10.10.1997 |
Opposition filed |
published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] |
22.11.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] |
19.10.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.06.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.04.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.02.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.01.1995 |
First examination report |
|
22.11.1994 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] |
03.02.1994 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] |
03.02.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] |
11.05.1993 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] |
16.04.1993 |
Change - designated states |
published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] |
31.07.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] |
31.07.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] |