EP0506749 - WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Melbourne Grattan Street Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MELBOURNE Grattan Street Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Kenneth, Charles 15 Fitzgibbon Street Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | 02 /
MEIKLE, Peter, John 19 Thornton Avenue Surrey Hills, VIC 3127 / AU | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1992/41] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91901250.0 | 19.12.1990 | [1992/41] | WO1990AU00600 | Priority number, date | AU19890007921 | 19.12.1989 Original published format: AU 792189 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109225 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506749 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506749 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.06.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/00, F03D7/06 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
F03D3/068 (EP);
Y02E10/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | WINDKRAFTMASCHINE | [1992/41] | English: | WIND TURBINE | [1992/41] | French: | TURBINE EOLIENNE | [1992/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1992 | Search fee paid | 30.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.1995 | BE | 18.10.1995 | ES | 18.10.1995 | FR | 18.10.1995 | GR | 18.10.1995 | IT | 18.10.1995 | NL | 18.10.1995 | LU | 31.12.1995 | SE | 18.01.1996 | [2006/32] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
BE | 18.10.1995 | ||
ES | 18.10.1995 | ||
GR | 18.10.1995 | ||
IT | 18.10.1995 | ||
NL | 18.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
FR | 15.03.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
BE | 18.10.1995 | ||
CH | 18.10.1995 | ||
ES | 18.10.1995 | ||
GR | 18.10.1995 | ||
IT | 18.10.1995 | ||
LI | 18.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
FR | 15.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
BE | 18.10.1995 | ||
CH | 18.10.1995 | ||
GR | 18.10.1995 | ||
IT | 18.10.1995 | ||
LI | 18.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
FR | 15.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
BE | 18.10.1995 | ||
GR | 18.10.1995 | ||
IT | 18.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
CH | 22.01.1996 | ||
LI | 22.01.1996 | ||
FR | 15.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
BE | 18.10.1995 | ||
GR | 18.10.1995 | ||
IT | 18.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
FR | 15.03.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
BE | 18.10.1995 | ||
IT | 18.10.1995 | ||
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
FR | 15.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/36] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
BE | 18.10.1995 | ||
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
FR | 15.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
BE | 18.10.1995 | ||
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 18.01.1996 | |
Former [N/P] | deleted | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2345600 (BOURQUARDEZ GASTON [FR]) | International search | [A]DE860930 (JAHNKE ERNST DIPL-ING); | [X]US4137009 (TELFORD JAMES W); | [X]GB2017230 (HAYES M R); | [X]GB2029909 (THOMPSON C J, et al); | [A]AU1871388 (BRIAN KINLOCH KIRKE) | [A] - DERWENT ABSTRACT Accession No. 85-195453/32, Class Q55, SU,A, 1134772 (GLADKII) 15 January 1985 (15.01.85). | Examination | DE860930 |