EP0506773 - A STIMULATOR OF VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL CELLS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XIU, Rui-Juan Magnus Ladulasgatan 31 S-116 27 Stockholm / SE | [1996/24] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states XIU, Rui-Jean Magnus Ladulasgatan 31 S-116 27 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Halldin, Bo, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Halldin, Bo, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192 S-104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 91901497.7 | 21.12.1990 | [1992/41] | WO1990SE00868 | Priority number, date | SE19890004353 | 22.12.1989 Original published format: SE 8904353 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109607 | Date: | 11.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506773 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506773 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/70 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
A61K36/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | STIMULATOR VON VASKULÄREN ENDOTHELZELLEN UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [1992/41] | English: | A STIMULATOR OF VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL CELLS AND USE THEREOF | [1992/41] | French: | STIMULATEUR DES CELLULES VASCULAIRES ENDOTHELIALES ET SON UTILISATION | [1992/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 12.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.1996 | BE | 10.04.1996 | CH | 10.04.1996 | DK | 10.04.1996 | ES | 10.04.1996 | FR | 10.04.1996 | GR | 10.04.1996 | IT | 10.04.1996 | LI | 10.04.1996 | NL | 10.04.1996 | SE | 10.07.1996 | DE | 11.07.1996 | GB | 21.12.1996 | LU | 31.12.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
DK | 10.04.1996 | ||
ES | 10.04.1996 | ||
GR | 10.04.1996 | ||
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
NL | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
GB | 21.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
DK | 10.04.1996 | ||
ES | 10.04.1996 | ||
GR | 10.04.1996 | ||
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
GB | 21.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
DK | 10.04.1996 | ||
GR | 10.04.1996 | ||
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
GB | 21.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
DK | 10.04.1996 | ||
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
GB | 21.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
DK | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
GB | 21.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/05] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
GB | 21.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/20] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
DE | 11.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 10.07.1996 | Cited in | International search | [X] - Dialog Information Services, File 351, World Patent Index 81-90, Dialog accession No. 88-253386/36, YG NONOGAWA SHOJI: "Antiinflammatory prepn. - contains active substance extracted from fruiting body or mycelium of heterobasidiae", JP 63183537, A, 880728, 8836 (Basic). | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 104, No. 23, 9 June 1986, (Columbus, Ohio, US), LIU SHUHUA et al: "Regeneration of hemopoietic tissue in grafted murine femur and demonstration of the effect of some radioprotectants", see page 380, Abstract 203144p, & Zhonghua Fangshe Yixue Yu Fanghu Zazhi 1985, 5 (4), 262-265a. | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 104 (1986), Abstract No. 122768t, Zhongcaoyao 1984, 15 (9), 23-6, 22 (Ch). |