EP0502998 - EXPLOSIVE DETECTION SCREENING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH CORPORATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 101 N. Wilmot Road, Suite 600 Tucson Arizona 85711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states RESEARCH CORPORATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 101 N. Wilmot Road, Suite 600 Tucson Arizona 85711 / US | ||
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states RESEARCH CORPORATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 6840 East Broadway Boulevard Tucson Arizona 85710-2815 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORRIGAN, Colin, D. Suite 1101 151 Bay Street Ottawa, Canada K1R 7T2 / CA | 02 /
HALEY, Lawrence, V. 1 Manju Street Ottawa, Ontario K1G 4T7 / CA | [1999/28] |
Former [1999/01] | 01 /
CORRIGAN, Colin, D. 530 Laurier Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1R 7T1 / CA | ||
02 /
HALEY, Lawrence, V. 1 Manju Street Ottawa, Ontario K1G 4T7 / CA | |||
Former [1992/38] | 01 /
CORRIGAN, Colin, D. 11 Tristan Court, Unit D Nepean, Ontario K2E 8B9 / CA | ||
02 /
HALEY, Lawrence, V. 11 Tristan Court, Unit D Nepean, Ontario K2E 8D9 / CA | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91901611.3 | 10.12.1990 | [1992/38] | WO1990US07269 | Priority number, date | US19890447724 | 08.12.1989 Original published format: US 447724 | US19900608496 | 02.11.1990 Original published format: US 608496 | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109307 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502998 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502998 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/00, G01N1/24, G01V9/00, G01N30/70, G01N33/22, G01N27/62 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
G01N27/622 (EP,US);
G01N1/2214 (EP,US);
G01N33/0081 (EP,US);
G01V9/007 (EP,US);
G01N1/24 (EP,US);
G01N2001/024 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/38] | G01N30/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | NACHWEISSYSTEM FÜR EXPLOSIFSTOFFE | [1992/38] | English: | EXPLOSIVE DETECTION SCREENING SYSTEM | [1992/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION D'EXPLOSIFS | [1992/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1992 | Search fee paid | 15.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 19.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98113501.5 / EP0881479 | EP98113514.8 / EP0881482 | EP98113528.8 / EP0881480 | EP98123024.6 / EP0905501 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 21.07.1999 | LU | 10.12.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2001/23] | GR | 21.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4013888 (MACIAS EDWARD S, et al); | [A]US4391151 (NELSON JOHN W, et al); | [A]GB2169078 (ANALYTICAL INSTR LTD); | [A]GB2176008 (ANALYTICAL INSTR LTD); | [ED]EP0401861 (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) | [A] - INTERNATIONAL LABORATORY. vol. 14, no. 1, January 1984, FAIRFIELD CT US pages 10 - 23 G.A.JUNK ET AL. 'sampling methods for organic compound in stacks' | [A] - NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS vol. 181, no. 1-3, March 1981, AMSTERDAM NL pages 481 - 485 KEMP ET AL. 'two stage discrete streaker' | International search | [A]US3748905 (FLETCHER J); | [A]US3988101 (ASPIN FRANK METCALF); | [A]GB2088055 (SECR DEFENCE); | [A]US4580440 (REID NEIL M [CA], et al); | [A]US4718268 (REID NEIL M [CA], et al); | [A]US4818870 (GRIFFITHS FRANK K [GB]); | [A]US4819477 (FISHER WILLIAM H [CA], et al); | [AP]US4909089 (ACHTER EUGENE K [US], et al); | [AP]US4909090 (MCGOWN JAMES B [US], et al); | [AP]US4964309 (JENKINS ANTHONY [US]) |