EP0510034 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SEAMLESS PREFABRICATED SKIRTING BOARD CORNER PIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.12.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HT TROPLAST AG Kaiserstrasse D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | [1994/41] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states HÜLS TROISDORF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 11 65 D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMBRICH, Karlheinz Clemens-August-Strasse 12-14 D-5300 Bonn 1 / DE | 02 /
NEUSCHAEFER-RUBE, Karl-Reinhard Hertzstrasse 13 D-5205 St. Augustin 3 / DE | 03 /
WINTER, Heinz Veledastrasse 23 D-5000 Köln 1 / DE | [1992/44] | Application number, filing date | 91901762.4 | 22.12.1990 | [1992/44] | WO1990EP02298 | Priority number, date | DE19904001055 | 16.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4001055 | [1992/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110554 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0510034 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0510034 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/00, E04F19/04 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
B29C51/00 (EP);
E04F19/0495 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VORGEFERTIGTEN NAHTLOSEN SOCKELLEISTEN-ECKSTÜCKEN | [1992/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SEAMLESS PREFABRICATED SKIRTING BOARD CORNER PIECES | [1992/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE GOUSSETS DE PLINTHES SANS JOINT PREFABRIQUES | [1992/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.1995
03.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE DLW Aktiengesellschaft Stuttgarter Strasse 75 D-74331 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.1995
03.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE DLW Aktiengesellschaft Stuttgarter Strasse 75 D-74331 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.1995
03.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE DLW Aktiengesellschaft Stuttgarter Strasse 75 D-74331 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.1995
03.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE DLW Aktiengesellschaft Stuttgarter Strasse 75 D-74331 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative Kurig, Thomas Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | 17.01.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.05.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.03.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.12.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/06] | Appeal following opposition | 09.07.1997 | Appeal received No. T0759/97 | 04.09.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.12.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE1068005 [ ]; | GB721086 [ ] (EJNER ROBERT TJORN); | US3115678 [ ] (ROLLIN KEEN WILLIAM, et al); | GB1023190 [ ] (NAIRN WILLIAMSON LTD); | GB1029631 [ ] (POLYGLAZE LTD); | DE2128024 [ ] (RUHRKOHLE AG); | DE2553231 [ ] (ROEHM GMBH); | DE3522420 [ ] (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) |