EP0504300 - A TRACKING SYSTEM IN AN OPTICAL RECORDING/REPRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. New Marunouchi Building Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. New Marunouchi Building Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Yasuaki 4-103 Dai Nippon Ink, Sakura Shataku 1550-2 Rokusaki Sakurashi, CHIBA PREF / JP | 02 /
YONEZAWA, Seiji, Dr. HITACHI, LTD, New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1,Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/50] |
Former [1992/39] | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Yasuaki 2-8-1-208, Shinden Ichikawa-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | ||
02 /
YONEZAWA, Seiji 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Representative(s) | Einsel, Robert, et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 91901766.5 | 04.12.1990 | [1992/39] | WO1990EP02099 | Priority number, date | JP19890313326 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31332689 | JP19890313327 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31332789 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9108568 | Date: | 13.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504300 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504300 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/095, G11B21/10, G11B7/013 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
G11B7/094 (EP);
G11B7/09 (EP);
G11B7/0901 (EP);
G11B7/0904 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1992/39] | Title | German: | SPURSTEUERSYSTEM FÜR EINE OPTISCHE AUFNAHME- UND ABTASTEINHEIT | [1992/39] | English: | A TRACKING SYSTEM IN AN OPTICAL RECORDING/REPRODUCING DEVICE | [1992/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE CENTRAGE DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT/REPRODUCTION OPTIQUE | [1992/39] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 27.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2158611 (RCA CORP); | [Y]EP0210330 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0246919 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [Y]GB2196115 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [Y]US4866688 (OHTAKE MASATOSHI [JP], et al) | Examination | - IEEE Transactions on Consumer Electronics, Vol.35, No4,Nov.1989, p.810-812. |