EP0506823 - LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT COPOLYMER AMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. Law Department, P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENCES, Charles, Francis 20 White Birch Lane Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 91902006.5 | 12.12.1990 | [1992/41] | WO1990US07426 | Priority number, date | US19890452527 | 18.12.1989 Original published format: US 452527 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109063 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506823 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506823 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/30, C08G81/02, C09B67/00 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
C09B67/0021 (EP,US);
C08F8/44 (EP,US);
C08G69/00 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/44, C08F8/30, C08F210/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | AMIDCOPOLYMERE MIT NIEDRIGEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT | [1992/41] | English: | LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT COPOLYMER AMIDES | [1992/41] | French: | AMIDES DE COPOLYMERES DE FAIBLE MASSE MOLECULAIRE | [1992/41] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.1994 | BE | 09.02.1994 | [1994/49] |
Former [1994/46] | AT | 09.02.1994 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB915453 (GEIGY CO LTD); | [X]US3388186 (KRAY RAYMOND J, et al); | [A]US3465059 (SEVEN MANFRED K, et al); | [X]US3634543 (SHERMAN NORMAN); | [X]US4035438 (NIELINGER WERNER, et al) |