EP0536133 - METHOD AND DEVICE IN CLOSED HEATING PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLÖERSEN, Stig Luotsikatu 4 B 12 SF-00160 Helsinki / FI | [1993/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Bjerkén, J. Hakan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | Bjerkén, Jarl Hakan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274 S-801 37 Gävle / SE | Application number, filing date | 91902105.5 | 08.01.1991 | [1993/15] | WO1991SE00012 | Priority number, date | SE19900000007 | 08.01.1990 Original published format: SE 9000007 | [1993/15] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110868 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0536133 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536133 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F24H8/00, F24D9/00 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
F24H4/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN GESCHLOSSENEN HEIZANLAGEN | [1993/15] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE IN CLOSED HEATING PLANTS | [1993/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF UTILISABLES DANS LES CHAUDIERES FERMEES POUR CHAUFFAGE CENTRAL | [1993/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1991 | Translation filed | 24.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4178988 (CANN PETER L [US], et al); | [Y]DE2855485 (BEHRENS HARTMUT); | [X]SE437723 (HEATREC AB [FI], et al); | [Y]DE2647216 |